judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

FULLER SPRINGS v. CITY OF LUFKIN

Case: B-4483
B-4483
02/15/1974
Application for Writ of Error
FULLER SPRINGS
CITY OF LUFKIN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Remarks Document
08/01/1974Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/27/1974Response to PetitionRespondent
02/15/1974Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Remarks Document
08/01/1974Motion for Rehearing
07/17/1974Opinion issued
05/01/1974Document received (See Remarks)
02/27/1974Response to Petition
02/15/1974Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/15/1974Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
CITY OF LUFKINRespondent
Fuller SpringsPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information