Case Information
19-3-01156-32 | PEREZ, ELIZABETH ANN vs PEREZ, WESLEY GABRIEL
Case Number
19-3-01156-32
Court
Spokane
Judicial Officer
IC CaseLoad, 93
File Date
05/13/2019
Case Type
DIC Dissolution of Marriage with Children
Case Status
Completed/Re-Completed
Party
Respondent (WIP)
PEREZ, WESLEY GABRIEL
DOB
XX/XX/XXXX
Active Attorneys
Petitioner (WIP)
PEREZ, ELIZABETH ANN
DOB
XX/XX/XXXX
Disposition Events
09/24/2019
Judicial Officer
Pelc, Julia
Judgment Type
Domestic
Monetary/Property Award
Creditors: PEREZ, ELIZABETH ANN
Debtors: PEREZ, WESLEY GABRIEL
Signed Date: 09/24/2019
Filed Date: 09/24/2019
Effective Date: 09/24/2019
Current Judgment Status:
Status: Active
Status Date: 09/24/2019
Property Award
Possession
Awarded To: PEREZ, ELIZABETH ANN
Parcel Number: 36075.0409
Comment
Comment ()
Events and Hearings
-
05/13/2019 Confidential Information Form
-
05/13/2019 Petition for Dissolution
-
05/13/2019 Temporary Restraining Order
-
05/13/2019 Notice of Assignment
-
09/13/2019 Ex Parte Action With Order
-
09/16/2019 Order Setting Status Conference
-
09/24/2019 Ex Parte Action With Order
-
09/24/2019 JIS Check Confidential Document Cover Sheet
-
09/24/2019 Parenting Plan Final Order
-
09/24/2019 Child Support Worksheet
-
09/24/2019 Order for Support
-
09/24/2019 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
-
09/24/2019 Decree of Dissolution
-
09/24/2019 Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial
-
11/21/2019 Notice of Change of Address
-
03/06/2020 Notice of Intent to Withdraw