Case: PD-1112-02
PD-1112-02
06/26/2002
PDR Case Type
JENKINS, KEVIN
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/31/2003 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
01/15/2003 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
01/15/2003 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
08/06/2002 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
06/26/2002 | PDR FILED | | |
06/26/2002 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/06/2003 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
STATE OF TEXAS | State | Michael R. Little |
JENKINS, KEVIN | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Stephen Christopher Taylor |
Court of Appeals Information:
13-00-00602-CR
REV & ACQ 4-19-02
13th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
344th District Court
Chambers
Honorable CARROLL E. WILBORN, JR.
10887