Case: 04-99-00635-CR
04-99-00635-CR
08/24/1999
Assault or Attempted Murder
Robert Villarreal
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/21/2018 | Internal memo | | |
11/27/2000 | Mandate Executed By The Trial Court | | |
11/27/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |
08/09/2000 | Submitted | | |
08/09/2000 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
08/09/2000 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/14/2000 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |
06/28/2000 | 10 Day letter to attorneys on no app's br filed | | |
05/05/2000 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/04/2000 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
04/07/2000 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
04/04/2000 | Reporters Record Filed | | |
03/09/2000 | Order Entered | | |
01/28/2000 | Late Record Letter To Court Reporter | | |
11/22/1999 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
11/22/1999 | Order Entered | | |
10/28/1999 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |
09/24/1999 | Clerks Record Filed | | |
08/26/1999 | Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case | | |
08/24/1999 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
08/24/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
08/20/1999 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
07/29/1999 | Date of Sentencing in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/21/2018 | Case Stored | Case archived |
11/27/2025 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Robert Villarreal | Criminal - Appellant | Edward P. Cano |
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Honorable Susan D. Reed |
Trial Judge, 227Th District Ct | INTERESTED PARTY | |
Court Reporter, 227Th District | INTERESTED PARTY |
Trial Court Information
227th Judicial District Court
Bexar
92-CR-7823
5 YEARS.