judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

HIDALGO GUARANTEE ABSTRACT COMPANY v. CITY OF EDINBURG, TEXAS

Case: A-153
A-153
04/24/1944
Application for Writ of Error
HIDALGO GUARANTEE ABSTRACT COMPANY
CITY OF EDINBURG, TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/22/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/17/1944Motion for RehearingAmicus Curiae
05/03/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/02/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
04/24/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/22/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/17/1944Motion for Rehearing
05/03/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/02/1944Response to Petition
04/24/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
04/24/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hidalgo Guarantee Abstract CompanyPetitioner
City of Edinburg, TexasRespondent
Stewart, Burgess and MorrisAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information