judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HICKS (DAVID) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34688
Short Caption:HICKS (DAVID) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C147228Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/20/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/19/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07734
10/06/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34688, 34691, 34693, 34706, 34715, 34716, 34738. 99-09621
01/20/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 01/18/00. 00-00948
01/20/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-11787
08/08/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-11993
08/08/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 20, 2001. 01-11993