judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DANIEL RAY HOLMAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-140)
Case Number:06-140Case Docketed On:06/19/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:DANIEL RAY HOLMAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DANIEL RAY HOLMAN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDaniel Ray HolmanThomas R. Smith
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling
Eric Alan Johnson
Geoffrey Gunnerson
Kevin Kessner

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:2008 WY 54
Citation:183 P.3d 368

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/19/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/19/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/19/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/19/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/03/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record on appeal and copy of brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
09/15/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/18/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/31/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/01/2006Order - Grant - extension of time (Received call from counsel for appellant, objects to extensions, will inform Court)OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/02/2006Response/Objection - Other, to motion for extension of time for appellee to file brief. (Per CJ, no action necessary at this time, but make court aware if or when another motion for extension of time is filed.)Response/ObjectionOtherFinal
12/14/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appeal and copy of brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
12/14/2006Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval for Geoffrey L. Gunnerson to appear on behalf of appelleeNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
12/26/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/08/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, TranscriptsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/01/2007Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval for Kevin Kessner to appear on behalf of appelleeNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
02/15/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Thomas R. Smith for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Sr. Asst. AG and Geoffrey Gunnerson, Student Director, argument by Mr. Gunnerson) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/15/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/14/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court. Justice Hill files a specially concurring opinion; Justice Burke files a dissenting opinion.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/15/2008Event - Phone Call - Eric Johnson called to say that Kevin Kessner, Student Intern, argued this case - not Mr. Gunnerson. The name changes will be sent to the publishers by Debbie Hehr.EventPhone CallFinal
05/16/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Opinion sent to warden signed for 5/15/08 by Jessica Martinez.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
05/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/30/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/30/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/03/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card - WardenServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
06/03/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal