judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: ANDREA R. BATEMAN

Case Information: 10-BG-0728
Short Caption:IN RE: ANDREA R. BATEMANClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Reciprocal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN205-10Filed Date:06/17/2010

Opening Event Date:06/17/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
William R. RossNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentAndrea Bateman NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/17/2010DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with a certified copy of an order of the Supreme Court of Florida suspending respondent, who is a suspended member of the DC Bar for failure to pay her DC Bar dues and failure to file the required annual registration statements, and remains suspended.
06/30/2010RECEIVED a copy of a letter from Bar Counsel to respondent advising respondent of Bar Counsel's recommendation to the court that respondent be suspended on an interim basis pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (d), and of the importance of filing a compliant affidavit.
07/13/2010ORDER Having received a certified copy of an order of the Supreme Court of Florida suspending respondent for ten days from the practice of law, it is, accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (d), ORDERED that respondent is suspended from the practice of law in the the District of Columbia pending final disposition of this proceeding, effective on the date of entry of this order, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent show cause within thirty days why she should not be suspended for ten days in the District of Columbia. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel shall reply to respondent's response no later than fifteen days after service of the response. Alternatively, no later than fifteen days after respondent's response was due, Bar Counsel may object to the imposition of reciprocal discipline based upon the factors set forth in D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (c). Bar Counsel shall provide the court with the relevant portions of the record of the proceeding in the other disciplining court, the statute and rules that governed it, and a short statement identifying all of the issues that the matter presents. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Bar Counsel opposes the imposition of identical discipline, Bar Counsel shall (1) recommend appropriate non-identical discipline or (2) request that the matter be referred to the Board for its recommendation as to discipline. Respondent may reply within ten days after service of Bar Counsel's submission. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's attention is drawn to the requirement of Rule XI, Sec 14 relating to suspended attorneys and to the provisions of Rule XI, Sec 16 (c) dealing with the timing of eligibility for reinstatement as related to compliance with Rule XI, Sec 14, including the filing of the required affidavit. (ETW)
08/12/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (respondent)
08/26/2010STATEMENT of Bar Counsel regarding reciprocal discipline.
08/30/2010TMC - notice of reciprocal discipline - OTSC - ROTSC - statement of Bar Counsel - supplmental statment of Bar Counsel - proposed order
11/02/2010STATEMENT (Supplemental) of Bar Counsel regarding reciprocal discipline.
11/18/2010FiledSUSPENSION ORDERED that Andrea R. Bateman, Esquire, is hereby suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia for a period of ten days. Although respondent filed a response to this court's show cause order her response failed to establish any exceptions under D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 11 (c). Additionall respondent may not re-litigate the factual basis for the discipline established in a sister proceeding. FURTHER ORDERED that for purposes of reinstatement respondent's suspension will not begin to run until such time as she files an affidavit that fully complies with the requirements of D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g). (OB,NE,ST)
12/02/2010RECEIVED from the Office of Bar Counsel a notice of nonfiling by respondent the required affidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14.