judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

DAY AND ZIMMERMAN, INC. AND UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ROBERT S. CALVERT, COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS OF THE STATE OF TEXAS, ET AL., BOB BULLOCK, COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS

Case: B-4512
B-4512
03/11/1974
Application for Writ of Error
DAY AND ZIMMERMAN, INC. AND UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
ROBERT S. CALVERT, COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS OF THE STATE OF TEXAS, ET AL., BOB BULLOCK, COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/28/1975Notice of Appeal filed
02/12/1975Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/15/1974Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/25/1974Response to PetitionRespondent
03/11/1974Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/25/1975Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
05/28/1975Notice of Appeal filed
03/07/1975Motion to Stay Filed Filing granted
02/20/1975Response to Motion filed
02/12/1975Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/29/1975Opinion issued
05/15/1974Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/15/1974Document received (See Remarks)
05/15/1974Document received (See Remarks)
05/15/1974Document received (See Remarks)
05/15/1974Document received (See Remarks)
05/15/1974Document received (See Remarks)
05/15/1974Document received (See Remarks)
03/25/1974Response to Petition
03/11/1974Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/11/1974Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Day and Zimmerman, Inc. and United States of AmericaPetitioner
Robert S. Calvert, Comptroller of Public Accounts of the State of Texas, et al.Respondent
GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATIONAmicus Curiae
Bob Bullock, Comptroller of Public AccountsRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information