Case: C-3215
C-3215
07/03/1984
WRIT ERROR - CAUSE
DR. THOMAS R. McKINLEY ET UX
LEON DROZD d/b/a DROZD CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/27/1985 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | Petitioner | | |
02/08/1985 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | MO RE OF DROZD | |
12/21/1984 | Post submission brief filed | Petitioner | | |
07/18/1984 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
07/03/1984 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/25/1985 | Mandate issued | | | |
03/06/1985 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | motion for rehearing overruled. Justice___not sit | | |
02/27/1985 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | | | |
02/14/1985 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | | | |
02/08/1985 | Motion for Rehearing | MO RE OF DROZD | | |
01/28/1985 | MET for Mo rehearing disposed of | Filing granted | REHEARING DUE FEB. 8, 1985 | |
01/24/1985 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing | | | |
01/10/1985 | cover ltr with jmt | | | |
01/09/1985 | Opinion issued | Court of Appeals' judgment reversed; trial court judgment affirmed | | |
12/21/1984 | Post submission brief filed | | | |
11/28/1984 | Oral argument | ARGUED FOR PET BY JOE K. LONGLEY ARGUED FOR RESP BY THOS D. BRACEY | | |
09/19/1984 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Filing granted | GRANTED ON PTS. 1,2, AND 3. | |
09/19/1984 | Writ of error issued to Court of Appeals. | | | |
07/18/1984 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
07/18/1984 | Reply to Response | | | |
07/03/1984 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
03/25/1985 | Case Stored | Case stored. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Court of Appeals Information:
Modified, Affirmed
670 SW2d 405
13th Court of Appeals
Honorable NOAH KENNEDY
Trial Court Information
36th District Court
Aransas
Honorable Ronald M. Yeager
6710