Case: 14-84-00330-CR
14-84-00330-CR
05/14/1984
Burglary
Batiste, Melvin
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/19/1985 | Mandate Issued | | |
12/20/1984 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
09/13/1984 | Mtn.withdraw as attorney DISPOSED-ANT,APE, | GRANTED | |
06/29/1984 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
06/29/1984 | Mtn.withdraw as attorney FILED-ANT,APE | | |
06/05/1984 | Record Filed (Both records FILED) | | |
05/14/1984 | Letter from atty with address change | | |
05/14/1984 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/19/1985 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - Appellant | Mr. Melvin Batiste |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - State of Texas | Calvin A. Hartmann |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - Appellant |
Trial Court Information
263rd District Court
Harris
287,150
2 yrs. TDC