Case: 05-84-00540-CR
05-84-00540-CR
05/10/1984
Sexual Abuse, Rape or Injury of a Child
Reeder, Richard Russell
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/26/2018 | Retention time case file will be retained | Retain | |
05/02/1985 | Mandate Issued | | |
12/06/1984 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
12/05/1984 | Submitted | | |
11/27/1984 | Appearance of counsel | | |
10/30/1984 | MattConv | | |
10/04/1984 | Brief Filed | | |
09/28/1984 | Brief Filed | | |
09/28/1984 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/28/1984 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
08/02/1984 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
08/02/1984 | Transcript Filed | | |
05/10/1984 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/02/1985 | Case Stored | Permanent retention required in criminal case |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
265th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable John D. Ovard
F83-82354-KR
4 yrs TDC