judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DELGADO (JERRY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34689
Short Caption:DELGADO (JERRY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38909 , 54282 , 54888
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C146184Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/07/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/19/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for Appellant). 99-07735
09/01/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-08190
09/01/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-08191
09/15/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment filed 8/19/99. Due Date: 10 days
09/27/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Judgment of Conviction (Jury Trial) appealed from filed in district court on: August 19, 1999. 99-09186
12/15/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 99-12615
12/16/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 through 3. 99-12721
01/18/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-00818
02/18/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Express-No Postmark. 00-02610
09/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-15717
09/07/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/14/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered Delgado's arguments and concluded they lack merit, " . . . we affirm the judgment of conviction." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-19963
12/12/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-19988
12/12/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/11/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 28, 2000. 00-19988