judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHEVRON U.S.A., INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-56)
Case Number:06-56Case Docketed On:03/16/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Rule 12.09(b) Certification - Civil - Taxation and Revenue (Title 39)
Short Title:CHEVRON U.S.A., INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHEVRON U.S.A., INC., Petitioner, v. DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, STATE OF WYOMING, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChevron U.S.A., Inc.William J. Thomson II
Randall B. Reed
Brian Joseph Hanify
AppelleeDepartment of RevenuePatrick J. Crank
Michael L. Hubbard
Martin L. Hardsocg
Cathleen D. Parker

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 79
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/16/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/16/2006Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order of certification Rule 12.09(b)Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder of certification Rule 12.09(b)Final
03/16/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/28/2006Order - Rule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptOrderRule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptFinal
04/21/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief - stipulated. Advised counsel to request extensions, individually, as necessary.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/21/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/30/2006Brief - Appellant; and received designation of record. Notified counsel that the designation of record must be filed in district court, not the Supreme Court. He indicated that he included both captions, but it was filed in district court.BriefAppellantFinal
05/30/2006Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
07/17/2006Brief - Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on 7/19/06.BriefAppelleeFinal
08/04/2006Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
08/04/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/16/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes. Volumes I-III, original papers; volume IV, agency record: No. 05-179, volumes 1-15; No. 03-341, volumes 1-29.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/16/2006Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
10/03/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/19/2006Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
10/24/2006Order - Oral argument scheduled. Filed order rescheduling setting for oral argument (moved from 11/16/06 to 11/14/06).OrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/14/2006Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (William J. Thomson and Randall B. Reed, argument by Mr. Thomson for appellant; Cathleen D. Parker, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/14/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/11/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/30/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/04/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal