Case: B-4496
B-4496
02/26/1974
Application for Writ of Error
OLIN CORPORATION
CONTINENTAL OIL COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/22/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
03/15/1974 | Response to Reply filed | Respondent | | |
03/08/1974 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
02/28/1974 | Appendix Filed | Respondent | | |
02/28/1974 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
02/26/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/22/1974 | Motion to Expedite | Filing granted | | |
05/22/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
03/15/1974 | Response to Reply filed | | ||
03/08/1974 | Reply to Response | | ||
02/28/1974 | Motion to Expedite | | ||
02/28/1974 | Appendix Filed | | ||
02/28/1974 | Response to Petition | | ||
02/26/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
02/26/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Continental Oil Company | Respondent | |
OLIN CORPORATION | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information