Case: B-48
B-48
01/13/1967
Application for Writ of Error
PHILLIPS PIPE LINE COMPANY
EMILIO RAZO, BECHTEL CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/18/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
08/15/1967 | Supplemental Brief filed | Respondent | | |
07/12/1967 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
01/30/1967 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
01/30/1967 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
01/25/1967 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
01/25/1967 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
01/13/1967 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/20/1967 | Letter Filed | | ||
11/29/1967 | Dissenting opinion issued. | | ||
10/23/1967 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
10/18/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
10/17/1967 | Motion to Argue filed | Overruled | | |
10/04/1967 | Opinion issued | | ||
08/15/1967 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
07/20/1967 | Letter Filed | | ||
07/12/1967 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
06/07/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/07/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/07/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/07/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/07/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/07/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/07/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/07/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/07/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/07/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/07/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/07/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
01/30/1967 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
01/30/1967 | Response to Petition | | ||
01/25/1967 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
01/25/1967 | Response to Petition | | ||
01/13/1967 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
01/13/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
PHILLIPS PIPE LINE COMPANY | Petitioner | |
Various Counsel for Pipe Line Companies | Amicus Curiae | |
Emilio Razo | Respondent | |
F. H. Pannill and W. B. Browder | Amicus Curiae | |
BECHTEL CORPORATION | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information