judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LYONS VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 34705
Short Caption:LYONS VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 40302
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C152816Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/23/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/23/1999Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition. 99-07838
11/19/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Order Denying Petition for Writ of Prohibition. " . . . we deny the petition." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-11521
12/13/1999Other Returned Unfiled Document.
12/15/1999RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 99-12622
12/15/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/27/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Recall Notice in Lieu of Remittitur and for Leave to File an Untimely Petition for Rehearing. 99-13213
01/26/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Order Denying Motions to Recall Notices in Lieu of Remittitur. We are not persuaded that counsel has demonstrated good cause for recalling the notices in lieu of remittitur. We deny petitioners' motion to recall the notices in lieu of the remittitur and for leave to file an untimely petition for rehearing. Nos. 34705, 34710. 00-01280
02/17/2000MotionFiled Motion. Petition for Rehearing of Motion to Recall Notice in Lieu of Remittitur and for Leave to File an Untimely Petition for Rehearing. (Mailed on: 2/14/00) 00-02539
05/31/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Petitioner has filed a petition seeking rehearing of an order entered on January 26, 2000, denying petitioner's motion to recall the notice in lieu of remittitur and for leave to file an untimely petiton for rehearing. We deny the petition for rehearing. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-09184