judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THE STATE OF WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, et al. v. LEONARD (LEE) WATTS

Case Heading (S-07-0095)
Case Number:S-07-0095Case Docketed On:04/30/2007
Linked To: S-07-0050
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:THE STATE OF WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, et al. v. LEONARD (LEE) WATTS
Full Title:THE STATE OF WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, WYOMING STATE PENITENTIARY, WYOMING HONOR FARM, Appellants (Defendants), v. LEONARD (LEE) WATTS, PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF TAMMY SUE WATTS, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDepartment of CorrectionsPatrick J. Crank
John William Renneisen
Misha Westby
Christopher Levi Martin
AppellantDepartment of Corrections - Wyoming State PenitentiaryPatrick J. Crank
John William Renneisen
Misha Westby
Christopher Levi Martin
AppellantDepartment of Corrections - Honor FarmPatrick J. Crank
John William Renneisen
Misha Westby
Christopher Levi Martin
AppelleeLeonard Lee WattsDavid B. Hooper
Tom A. Glassberg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/30/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/30/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/30/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/23/2007Order - Other. Order requiring briefing on jurisdictional issue.OrderOtherFinal
06/04/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
06/18/2007Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/29/2007Brief - Appellant reply; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppellant replyFinal
07/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/06/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/09/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volumes I & II, original papers; Volume III, transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/09/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
07/11/2007Order - Consolidating cases, for purposes of oral argument and decision.OrderConsolidating casesFinal
07/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, Misha Westby.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/20/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from David B. Hooper on behalf of appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/15/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Christopher Levi Martin, Senior Assistant Attorney General and Misha Westby, Senior Assistant Attorney General, argument by Ms. Westby for appellants; David B. Hooper for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/15/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/22/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/11/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/11/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/14/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 3/12/08 by Kristi Green.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal