judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SILAS C. FORTUNE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0746
Short Caption:SILAS C. FORTUNE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead: 10-CF-0570 Consolidated:10-CF-0746
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-29408-07Filed Date:06/14/2010

Opening Event Date:06/14/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/02/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/03/2011
Argued/Submitted:06/15/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/17/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSilas C. Fortune Y
Gregory S. SmithYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/14/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/28/2010ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 10-CF-570 and 10-CF-746 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that Gregory Smith, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant Silas C. Fortune in appeal no. 10-CF-746. F/O that counsel for appellant Silas C. Fortune shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
07/13/2010RECEIVED - motion for appeal transcript (Fortune)
08/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (36 pgs/tape) 12/12/08 proc. CD attached
08/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (47 pgs/Burr) 7/15/09 proc.
08/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (241 pgs/Pirfo) 1/27-28/10 proc.
08/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (458 pgs/Richer) 2/1-2/10 proc.
08/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (459-589 pgs/Richer) 2/3-4/10 proc.
08/02/2010RECORD COMPLETED
08/05/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' briefs and the limited appendixes including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
08/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (sealed pleadings)
08/09/2010RECORD COPIES (10-CF-570)
08/09/2010RECORD INDEX (10-CF-570)
09/09/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days. (Fortune) no oppo
09/10/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (Wood) and appendix 60 days no oppo
09/16/2010 On consideration of appellants Silas C. Fortune and Anwar R. Woods' unopposed motions for extensions of time within which to file their briefs, it is ORDERED that appellant Silas C. Fortune's motion is granted and appellant Silas C. Fortune's brief and limited appendix shall be filed October 14, 2010. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant Anwar R. Woods motion is granted and appellant Anwar R. Woods brief and limited appendix shall be filed November 15, 2010. (JAC)
10/14/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until November 15, 2010 (Fortune) (unopposed)
10/15/2010RECEIVED- aplt's brief and appendix (Fortune)
10/21/2010 On consideration of appellant Silas C. Fortune's consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, and the lodged brief and limited appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion of appellant Fortune is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief and limited appendix of Anwar R. Woods remain to be due on or before November 15, 2010. (Castillo)
10/21/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF - Fortune
10/21/2010APPENDIX - Fortune
11/16/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (Woods)(unopposed)
11/16/2010RECEIVED - Appellant's Brief and Appendix (Woods)
11/18/2010 On consideration of appellant Anwar R. Woods' unopposed motion for leave to late file the lodged brief and appendix, it is ORDERED that appellant Anwar R. Woods' motion is granted and the lodged brief and appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the consolidated brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of the order. (Castillo)
11/18/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF - (Woods)
11/18/2010APPENDIX - (Woods)
11/22/2010RECORD COPIES 10cf746
11/22/2010RECORD INDEX 10CF746
11/22/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (D.C.pretrial service agency requestfor judicial action report-filed 9/25/08, order sealing bench conference Judge Iscoe- filed1/27/10) (yellow envelope)
12/15/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 2/3/11. no oppo
12/21/2010 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before February 3, 2011. (JAC)
02/03/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
02/03/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
05/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
06/15/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/15/2011SUBMITTED (Washington, Blackburne-Rigsby, Nebeker)
10/26/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judge, and Nebeker, Senior Judge.)
11/17/2011FiledMandate
11/18/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)