Case: B-49
B-49
01/16/1967
Application for Writ of Error
GWENDOLYN MCFARLAND
FRANKLIN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/20/1967 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
02/06/1967 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
01/30/1967 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
01/16/1967 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/07/1967 | Opinion issued | | ||
03/20/1967 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
03/01/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
03/01/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
03/01/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
02/06/1967 | Reply to Response | | ||
01/30/1967 | Response to Petition | | ||
01/16/1967 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
01/16/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Franklin Life Insurance Company | Respondent | |
Gwendolyn McFarland | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information