Case: B-77
B-77
02/01/1967
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS
CENTRAL POWER AND LIGHT COMPAY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/24/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
03/23/1967 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
02/02/1967 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
02/01/1967 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/24/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
03/23/1967 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
02/23/1967 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
02/02/1967 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
02/01/1967 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
02/01/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State of Texas | Petitioner | |
Baker, Botts, Shepherd and Coates | Amicus Curiae | |
Central Power and Light Compay | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information