judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANNETTE METZ; BONNIE HORTON; and PAM BASILE v. LARAMIE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1; LINDA WILLMAN; TOM ROONEY; and JEFF CONINE, in their individual and official capacities,

Case Heading (06-159)
Case Number:06-159Case Docketed On:07/07/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:ANNETTE METZ; BONNIE HORTON; and PAM BASILE v. LARAMIE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1; LINDA WILLMAN; TOM ROONEY; and JEFF CONINE, in their individual and official capacities,
Full Title:ANNETTE METZ; BONNIE HORTON; and PAM BASILE, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. LARAMIE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1; LINDA WILLMAN; TOM ROONEY; and JEFF CONINE, in their individual and official capacities, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAnnette MetzBruce S. Asay
AppellantBonnie HortonBruce S. Asay
AppellantPam BasileBruce S. Asay
AppelleeLaramie County School District No. 1David F. Evans
Brandi Lee Monger
AppelleeLinda WillmanDavid F. Evans
Brandi Lee Monger
AppelleeTom RooneyDavid F. Evans
Brandi Lee Monger
AppelleeJeff ConineDavid F. Evans
Brandi Lee Monger

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 166
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/07/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/07/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/07/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/07/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/24/2006Brief - Appellants; received copy of designation of record on appeal and copy of brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
10/11/2006Brief - Appellees; received copy of designation of record on appeal and copy of brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
10/12/2006Notice-Incoming - Attachment, Appendix to brief of appellees inadvertently left off of copiesNotice-IncomingAttachmentFinal
10/30/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/30/2006Brief - Appellants replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/06/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/07/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes. Volumes I - III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Sealed DocumentsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/07/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/09/2006Motion - Oral argument - vacate (Continuance)MotionOral argument - vacateFinal
11/13/2006Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
11/15/2006Motion - Withdrawal of counsel Scott A. HomarMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
11/16/2006Order - Granting withdrawal of counselOrderGrantFinal
12/26/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/13/2007Event - Oral argument presented. (Bruce S. Asay for appellants and David Evans and Brandi Monger, argument by Ms. Monger for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/13/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/06/2007Notice-Internal - Other - law clerk noticed all even numbered pages missing from agreement in the record and requested that full document be obtained.Notice-InternalOtherFinal
09/06/2007Event - Phone Call - contacted district court clerk regarding agreement. She doesn't have it. Contacted counsel for appellant. He will take complete copy to district court for filing and bring filed copy to this office.EventPhone CallFinal
09/07/2007Notice-Incoming - Correction. Received complete copy of Plaintiffs' Attachment G. The original was filed at the Clerk of District Court. Clipped this to original record from district court and returned to law clerk.Notice-IncomingCorrectionFinal
10/23/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/08/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/08/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/13/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 11/09/07 by Rosemary Montez.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal