judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CARLIN BERNARD FREDERICK V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0745
Short Caption:CARLIN BERNARD FREDERICK V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-19879-09Filed Date:06/09/2010

Opening Event Date:06/09/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/27/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCarlin B. Frederick Y
Donald L. DworskyNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/09/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/28/2010ORDERED that counsel shall file a suggestion of death within 15 days from the date of this order. (JAC)
07/15/2010APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to Late File Suggestion of Death (no oppo).
07/22/2010ORDERED that counsel for appellant's motion is granted and counsel shall file a suggestion of death within 45 days from the date of this order. (JAC)
08/27/2010MISCELLANEOUS - aplt's suggestion of death.
09/03/2010ORDERED that this appeal is dismissed, and the case is remanded to the Superior Court with directions to vacate the conviction and abate the prosecution, by reason of death, upon the filing of a certificated copy of appellant's death certificate or other competent evidence of death. See Howell v. United States, 455 A.2d 1371, 1373 (D.C. 1983)(en banc). (ETW)
09/03/2010DISMISSED
09/27/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/18/2014FiledArchived