judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-135
A-135
04/08/1944
Application for Writ of Error
ERNEST LOYD
F. D. HERRINGTON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/06/1944Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
10/25/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/06/1944Response to Brief filedRespondent
06/02/1944Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
05/26/1944Brief on the MeritsRespondent
04/08/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/06/1944Brief in Support of Petition
10/25/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/06/1944Response to Brief filed
06/02/1944Supplemental Brief filed
05/26/1944Brief on the Merits
05/11/1944Stipulation Filed (see Remarks)
05/10/1944Document received (See Remarks)
05/10/1944Document received (See Remarks)
05/10/1944Document received (See Remarks)
04/08/1944Additional Copies receivedFiling granted
04/08/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/08/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ernest LoydPetitioner
F. D. HerringtonRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information