Case: B-7947
B-7947
10/03/1978
Application for Writ of Error
VICTOR A. PEKAR
ST. LUKES HOSPITAL, DR. BRUCE M. CAMERON AND DR. MARSHALL G. HENRY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/08/1979 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
12/29/1978 | Supplement to Petition filed | Petitioner | | |
10/19/1978 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
10/18/1978 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
10/03/1978 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/08/1979 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
12/29/1978 | Supplement to Petition filed | | ||
10/19/1978 | Response to Petition | | ||
10/18/1978 | Response to Petition | | ||
10/03/1978 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
10/03/1978 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
St. Lukes Hospital | Respondent | |
Dr. Bruce M. Cameron and Dr. Marshall G. Henry | Respondent | |
Victor A. Pekar | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information