Case: B-7943
B-7943
10/03/1978
Application for Writ of Error
ESPERANZA GUTIERREZ
EDWARD R. COLLINS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/27/1979 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
05/02/1979 | Letter brief | Amicus Curiae | | |
11/13/1978 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
10/17/1978 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
10/03/1978 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/02/1979 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
06/27/1979 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
06/13/1979 | Opinion issued | | ||
05/02/1979 | Letter brief | | ||
01/24/1979 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/13/1978 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
10/17/1978 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
10/03/1978 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
10/03/1978 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Edward R. Collins | Respondent | |
Esperanza Gutierrez | Petitioner | |
Tom H. Davis | Amicus Curiae |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information