Case: D-0653
D-0653
01/03/1991
App Writ of Error
S.M. FERGUSON JR. and S.M. FERGUSON JR. INC.
CHILLICOTHE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/05/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
02/22/1991 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | Received 02-21-91 without fee's | |
01/16/1991 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
01/03/1991 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/05/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
03/21/1991 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | Rehearing Overruled | | |
03/20/1991 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Overruled | Rehearing Overruled | |
02/22/1991 | Conditional motion for rehearing | No description available. | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | |
02/22/1991 | Motion for Rehearing | Received 02-21-91 without fee's | | |
02/22/1991 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | | | |
02/21/1991 | Notice requesting filing fee | Mo/Re - $10.00 | | |
02/06/1991 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | Writ Denied | |
01/17/1991 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
01/17/1991 | No description available. | | | |
01/16/1991 | Reply to Response | | | |
01/04/1991 | MET to file reply disposed of | Filing granted | reply due 01-17-91 | |
01/03/1991 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
03/21/1991 | Case Stored | Case stored. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
HARDEMAN COUNTY APPRAISAL DIST | Respondent | Mr. Roy L. Armstrong |
CHILLICOTHE ISD | Respondent | Honorable Dan Mike Bird |
PARKER, BILL | Respondent | Honorable Dan Mike Bird |
FERGUSON, S.M., JR., INC. | Petitioner | Mr. Robert M. Greenberg Mr. C. Steven Matlock |
BROCK, SHARON | Respondent | Honorable Dan Mike Bird |
BARTLEY, HOWARD | Respondent | Mr. Roy L. Armstrong |
HAMPTON, JR., OSCAR B. | Respondent | Honorable Dan Mike Bird |
FERGUSON, JR., S.M. | Petitioner | Mr. J. H. Edgar |
WOOD, HELEN | Respondent | Mr. Roy L. Armstrong |
Court of Appeals Information:
07-88-00284-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
___ SW2d ___, 10-29-90
7th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
46th District Court
Hardeman
Honorable Leslie Thomas
8065