Case: 02-91-00056-CV
02-91-00056-CV
03/26/1991
Injunction
HUGHES, THOMAS P., DISTRICT CLERK, TARRANT COUNTY;AND DON CARPENTER, SHERIFF, TARRANT COUNTY
MORGAN, GLENDA
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/13/1992 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/08/1992 | Writ Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
11/27/1991 | Writ Filed | | |
10/30/1991 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
10/10/1991 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
09/25/1991 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Rendered | |
05/31/1991 | Letter Brief Filed | | |
05/29/1991 | Submitted | | |
05/29/1991 | Submission | | |
05/09/1991 | Brief Filed | | |
05/09/1991 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/01/1991 | No Description Available. | | |
04/23/1991 | Extension to File Supp. Transcript Disposed | | |
04/19/1991 | Brief Filed | | |
04/12/1991 | Extension to File Supp. Transcript Filed | | |
04/03/1991 | Exhibits Filed | | |
04/03/1991 | No Description Available. | | |
03/28/1991 | No Description Available. | | |
03/28/1991 | Submission | | |
03/26/1991 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
03/26/1991 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/13/1992 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Morgan, Glenda | Appellee | |
Hughes, Thomas P. District Cl | Appellant |
Trial Court Information
17th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Fred W. Davis
17-133351-91