Case: 03-04-00225-CV
03-04-00225-CV
04/07/2004
Summary judgment
Dr. Byron D. Brent
Benny Daneshjou; Daneshjou Resources, Inc.; and Daneshjou Daran, Inc.
No
www.txcourts.gov/3rdcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/05/2008 | Case stored | | |||||
01/19/2006 | Mandate Issued | | |||||
11/04/2005 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
09/16/2005 | Supplemental Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
08/17/2005 | Telephone discussion between clerk's office & others | | |||||
01/28/2005 | p/card sent to parties advising new panel | | |||||
10/11/2004 | Submitted | | |||||
10/06/2004 | Reply brief filed | | |||||
10/06/2004 | Record has been checked in-see remarks | | |||||
09/29/2004 | Record checked out - see remarks | | |||||
09/28/2004 | Extension to file reply brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
09/23/2004 | Filing fee paid | | |||||
09/20/2004 | Filing fee requested | | |||||
09/17/2004 | Extension to file reply brief | | |||||
08/30/2004 | Oral argument requested | | |||||
08/30/2004 | Brief filed | | |||||
08/27/2004 | Correction filed | | |||||
08/24/2004 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||
07/30/2004 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
07/28/2004 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
07/28/2004 | Oral argument request overruled by Court | | |||||
07/27/2004 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||||
07/08/2004 | Record has been checked in-see remarks | | |||||
07/07/2004 | Record checked out - see remarks | | |||||
06/28/2004 | Oral argument requested | | |||||
06/28/2004 | Brief filed | | |||||
06/28/2004 | Record has been checked in-see remarks | | |||||
06/23/2004 | Supplemental Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
06/02/2004 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
06/01/2004 | Letter received | | |||||
05/28/2004 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||||
05/18/2004 | Record checked out - see remarks | | |||||
05/06/2004 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
05/06/2004 | ADR letter w/docketing statement | | |||||
04/07/2004 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||||
04/07/2004 | Docketing statement received | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/19/2006 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Daneshjou Daran, Inc. | Appellee | Mr. Robert A. MacInnes Mr. Sam Lively |
Daneshjou, Benny | Appellee | Mr. Robert A. MacInnes Mr. Sam Lively |
Daneshjou Resources, Inc. | Appellee | Mr. Robert A. MacInnes Mr. Sam Lively |
Brent, Byron D. | Appellant | Mr. Richard L. Crozier |
Trial Court Information
200th District Court
Travis
Honorable Darlene Byrne
GN204227