Case: B-4964
B-4964
07/16/1974
Application for Writ of Error
CITIZENS NATIONAL BANK OF PARIS, ET AL.
ROBERT S. CALVERT, COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/31/1975 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
06/13/1975 | Response to Brief filed | Respondent | | |
05/30/1975 | Post submission brief filed | Respondent | | |
05/29/1975 | Post submission brief filed | Petitioner | | |
03/03/1975 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
02/25/1975 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
02/12/1975 | Brief in Support of Petition | Petitioner | | |
12/09/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/22/1975 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
07/31/1975 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
06/13/1975 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
05/30/1975 | Post submission brief filed | | ||
05/29/1975 | Post submission brief filed | | ||
04/16/1975 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
04/16/1975 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
04/16/1975 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
04/16/1975 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
03/03/1975 | Reply to Response | | ||
03/03/1975 | Motion to amend application for writ of error | | ||
02/25/1975 | Response to Petition | | ||
02/12/1975 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
12/13/1974 | Motion for emergency stay filed | | ||
12/09/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
12/09/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
07/16/1974 | Opinion issued | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Robert S. Calvert, Comptroller of Public Accounts, et al. | Respondent | |
Citizens National Bank of Paris, et al. | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information