Case: 99-0592
99-0592
06/23/1999
Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review pursuant to Tex. R. App. P. 53.7(f)
E. NICHOLAS MILAM
THE NATIONAL INSURANCE CRIME BUREAU and GARY EVANS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/18/1999 | Case Stored | 31-C-1 | | |
10/08/1999 | Case Stored | | | |
07/27/1999 | Letter sent to parties from Supreme Court - See Remarks | to Kevin B. Miller, cover for returned petition for review. | | |
07/27/1999 | Returned document(s). See Remarks. | Petition for Review returned to Kevin B. Miller. | | |
07/26/1999 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | to Catalina @ Miller's office to inform her that our office will refund the fee for petition for review. $75.00. to tax id # 742733198, Miller & Henderson | | |
07/20/1999 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | spoke w/Catalina in K. Millers office to request check for $10.00 for 53.7(f) motion. | | |
07/01/1999 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Overruled | | |
06/28/1999 | Certification (various) in case received | Certificate of conference on behalf of Kevin B. Miller | | |
06/23/1999 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | | | |
06/23/1999 | Petition for writ received | rec'd ck#3935 @ $85.00 in bag. | | |
06/23/1999 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | to Kevin Miller, requested O + 11 copies of certificate of conference for 53.7(f) motion filed. | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
10/18/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 31-C-2 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
MILAM, E. NICHOLAS | Petitioner | Mr. Kevin Bruce Miller |
THE NATIONAL INSURANCE CRIME B | Respondent | Mr. Jonathan Christopher Kieschnick Mr. Ryan G. Anderson Mr. Barry A. McClenahan |
Court of Appeals Information:
04-98-00486-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
989 SW2d 126, 01-27-99
4th Court of Appeals
Honorable PHIL HARDBERGER
Trial Court Information
285th District Court
Bexar
Honorable Michael Parker Peden
96-CI05011