judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ROBERT S. CALVERT, COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS, JESSE JAMES, STATE TREASURER AND JOHN L. HILL, ATTORNEY GENERAL v. TEXAS PIPE LINE COMPANY, ET AL.

Case: B-4763
B-4763
07/08/1974
Application for Writ of Error
ROBERT S. CALVERT, COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS, JESSE JAMES, STATE TREASURER AND JOHN L. HILL, ATTORNEY GENERAL
TEXAS PIPE LINE COMPANY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/13/1975Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/04/1974Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
12/04/1974Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
07/22/1974Response to PetitionRespondent
07/08/1974Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/14/1975Response to Motion filed
01/13/1975Motion for Rehearing
12/30/1974Opinion issued
12/04/1974Supplemental Brief filed
12/04/1974Supplemental Brief filed
10/16/1974Document received (See Remarks)
07/22/1974Response to Petition
07/08/1974Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/08/1974Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Robert S. Calvert, Comptroller of Public Accounts, Jesse James, State Treasurer and John L. Hill, Attorney GeneralPetitioner
Texas Pipe Line Company, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information