judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

HARVEY H. LANE, JR. AND STERLING HOLLOWAY v. ROBERT O. PHILLIPS, ET UX.

Case: B-4771
B-4771
07/12/1974
Application for Writ of Error
HARVEY H. LANE, JR. AND STERLING HOLLOWAY
ROBERT O. PHILLIPS, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/13/1974Response to Brief filedPetitioner
12/05/1974Response to Brief filedRespondent
12/02/1974Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
11/20/1974Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/12/1974Reply to ResponsePetitioner
07/26/1974Response to PetitionRespondent
07/12/1974Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/13/1974Response to Brief filed
12/05/1974Response to Brief filed
12/02/1974Brief in Support of Petition
11/21/1974Response to Motion filed
11/20/1974Motion for Rehearing
08/12/1974Reply to Response
07/26/1974Response to Petition
07/12/1974Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/12/1974Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Harvey H. Lane, Jr. and Sterling HollowayPetitioner
Robert O. Phillips, et ux.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information