Case: 02-99-00253-CR
02-99-00253-CR
06/23/1999
Other Drug Possession or Delivery
Dietrich S. Irving
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/28/2001 | Mandate Issued | | |
05/09/2001 | Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/05/2001 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
01/05/2000 | Submitted | | |
11/24/1999 | Submission | | |
11/24/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
11/24/1999 | Brief Filed | | |
11/12/1999 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/10/1999 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
10/11/1999 | Brief Filed | | |
09/10/1999 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
08/02/1999 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
08/02/1999 | Jury lists and/or questionnaires filed | | |
08/02/1999 | Received Reporter's Record Affidavit or Letter | | |
08/02/1999 | Request for Extension of Reporter's Record | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/02/1999 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
06/23/1999 | Appellant's Notice of Appeal | | |
06/23/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/28/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Charles M. Mallin |
Irving, Dietrich S. | Criminal - Appellant | William Stanley Harris |
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1
Tarrant
Honorable Sharen Wilson
0707034D
ct1-12yrs; IDTDCJ