judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TREMAINE L. MOORE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-0739
Short Caption:TREMAINE L. MOORE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD26015-09Filed Date:06/11/2010

Opening Event Date:06/11/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/02/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/12/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTremaine L. Moore Y
Warren GormanYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Kevin A. Chambers NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/10/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Warren Gorman, Esquire
06/11/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/29/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Warren Gorman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal nunc pro tunc to June 10, 2010. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
08/05/2010 On consideration of this court's order of June 29, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (JAC)
08/12/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT (no oppo)
08/12/2010RECEIVED - aplt's statement regarding transcript
09/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (78pgs/Hill) 6/10/10 proc. w/CD included
09/02/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/15/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
09/15/2010APPENDIX
09/16/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (By: JAC)
09/16/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
09/20/2010RECORD INDEX
09/20/2010RECORD COPIES
10/20/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
10/21/2010TMC - motion for summary affirmance - appellant's brief/appdx
12/21/2010On consideration of appellee's motion for summary affirmance, appellant's brief and the record on appeal, it is ORDERED that teh motion for summary affirmance is granted and the judgment on appeal affirmed (see order) (FIOBFA)
12/21/2010AFFIRMED
01/12/2011MANDATE ISSUED