judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARK ALLEN DRAKE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0092)
Case Number:S-07-0092Case Docketed On:04/26/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Converse CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:MARK ALLEN DRAKE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MARK ALLEN DRAKE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMark Allen DrakeDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Dana Jill Lent

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing -Restitution and Other Assessments
Opinion Number:2008 WY 48
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/26/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/26/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/08/2007Notice-Incoming - Amended index and notification of filing of transcript omitted inadvertentlyNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
06/13/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
07/31/2007Brief - Failure to file - appelleeBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
07/31/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/31/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appeal BRIEF UNTIMELY FILEDBriefAppelleeFinal
07/31/2007Motion - Accept late filing -brief of appelleeMotionAccept late filingFinal
08/06/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, six volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volumes II-V, transcripts; Volume VI, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
08/07/2007Order - Granting consideration of appellee's brief.OrderGrantFinal
08/07/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/27/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/27/2008Motion - Withdrawal of counsel on behalf of appellantMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
03/07/2008Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance by Tina N. Kerin on behalf of appellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
03/10/2008Order - Granting withdrawal of counselOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
04/22/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/08/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/08/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/12/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 5/9/08 by P. McCullough.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal