Case: 13-02-00642-CR
13-02-00642-CR
09/25/2002
Aggravated Robbery
RICARDO GARCIA
THE STATE OF TEXAS
No
14th Court of Appeals
11/13/2002
13th Court of Appeals - Corpus Christi
11/07/2002
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/25/2013 | Case stored | | |||
07/05/2012 | Letter received | | |||
07/02/2012 | Letter received | | |||
01/12/2007 | Case stored | | |||
01/08/2007 | Letter filed | | |||
12/21/2006 | Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk | | |||
05/14/2004 | Mandate Recd Ct Crim App / Dt. Clk | | |||
05/06/2004 | Mandate Issued | | |||
02/12/2004 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
09/19/2003 | Reinstate appeal | | |||
09/19/2003 | supplemental clerk's record | | |||
09/04/2003 | CHECKOUT SHT FOR REQUESTED DOCUMENTS | | |||
09/02/2003 | Submitted | | |||
09/02/2003 | Record checked out | | |||
08/28/2003 | Order Issued with Disposition | Abated | | ||
08/11/2003 | Submission | | |||
06/27/2003 | Exhibits Filed | | |||
06/18/2003 | Green card in | | |||
06/12/2003 | Letter sent to attorneys | | |||
06/05/2003 | CHECKOUT SHT FOR REQUESTED DOCUMENTS | | |||
05/30/2003 | OA Only if Opposing Party Requests OA | | |||
05/30/2003 | Brief Filed | | |||
05/22/2003 | request for documents | | |||
05/22/2003 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
05/12/2003 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
04/24/2003 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
04/08/2003 | Motion to Supplement | | |||
04/08/2003 | Case ready to be set | | |||
04/08/2003 | No oral argument requested | | |||
04/08/2003 | Brief Filed | | |||
04/03/2003 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
03/17/2003 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
02/10/2003 | Exhibits Filed | | |||
02/10/2003 | Court Reporter Pages | | |||
02/10/2003 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||
12/04/2002 | 30 Day Letter Sent | | |||
11/13/2002 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |||
11/07/2002 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
11/05/2002 | docketing statement filed | | |||
11/04/2002 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
11/04/2002 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
10/01/2002 | Clerks notice of appeal filed | | |||
09/18/2002 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/06/2004 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Garcia, Ricardo | Appellant | Clinton F. Greenwood |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Jessica D'Anna Hon. William J. Delmore III |
Trial Court Information
208th District Court
Harris
Honorable Larry Lee Fuller
892,400
36yrs TDCJ