Case: B-4783
B-4783
07/18/1974
MISC PETITION
MERCHANDISE MART, INC.
HERMAN MARCUS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/21/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
10/22/1974 | Response to Brief filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/02/1974 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
11/21/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
11/06/1974 | Opinion issued | | ||
10/22/1974 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
08/02/1974 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
07/18/1974 | Miscellaneous Motion | | ||
07/18/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Herman Marcus | Respondent | |
Merchandise Mart, Inc. | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information