Case: B-4787
B-4787
07/22/1974
Application for Writ of Error
DALE E. MUELLER
WILLIAM B. EVANS AND LUELLA EVANS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/06/1974 | Errata Filed | Respondent | | |
12/04/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
08/01/1974 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
07/22/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/10/1975 | Corrected opinion | | ||
12/09/1974 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
12/06/1974 | Errata Filed | | ||
12/04/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
11/20/1974 | Opinion issued | | ||
11/20/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/20/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/20/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
08/01/1974 | Response to Petition | | ||
07/22/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
07/22/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Dale E. Mueller | Petitioner | |
William B. Evans and Luella Evans | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information