Case: B-4796
B-4796
07/26/1974
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSCIATION
TROY CREWELL
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/06/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
08/07/1974 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
08/06/1974 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
07/26/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/13/1974 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
12/06/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
08/07/1974 | Response to Petition | | ||
08/06/1974 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
07/26/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
07/26/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Troy Crewell | Respondent | |
TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY | Amicus Curiae | |
Texas Employers Insurance Assciation | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information