judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

FEDERAL UNDERWRITERS EXCHANGE v. CHRISTINE A. HALL, ET AL.

Case: A-144
A-144
04/17/1944
Application for Writ of Error
FEDERAL UNDERWRITERS EXCHANGE
CHRISTINE A. HALL, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/24/1944Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
04/27/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
04/26/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
04/17/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/24/1944Supplemental Brief filed
05/06/1944Stipulation Filed (see Remarks)
05/03/1944Document received (See Remarks)
04/27/1944Brief in Support of Petition
04/26/1944Response to Petition
04/17/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/17/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Federal Underwriters ExchangePetitioner
Christine A. Hall, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information