judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HAGER VS. HAGER

Case Information: 34698
Short Caption:HAGER VS. HAGERCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35971
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV9801077Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/30/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/19/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Robert R. Hager--check no. 661.
08/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07773
09/24/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Partially Dismissing Appeal and Requesting Record on Appeal. An untimely notice of appeal fails to vest jurisdiction in this court. We are without jurisdiction to consider an appeal from the divorce decree. We conclude that we have jurisdiction to consider that part of this appeal which challenges the order finding appellant in contempt. Accordingly, within 30 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court the original trial court record pertaining to this appeal. [fn1] The record on appeal shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. 99-09157
09/30/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Record SEALED per district court order filed 5/18/99. 99-09415
09/30/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/07/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Bankruptcy. 99-09686
10/08/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Affidavit of Service for Notice of Bankruptcy. "MISSING" 99-09751
11/04/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order of Temporary Stay. This appeal is subject to the automatic bankruptcy stay, because appellant was the defendant in the action below. We stay further proceedings in this appeal pending the lifting of thebankruptcy stay or final resolution of the bankruptcy proceedings. Appellant shall inform this court of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings within 90 days from the date of this order, and each 90 days thereafter until furthr order of this court. Failure to do so may result in the imposition of sanctions. 99-10851
03/03/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Status Report. Status report due from appellant: 10 days from the date of this order. Leave is specifically granted to appellant, who is in proper person, to file the status report, and no other document. If appellant does not timely file a status report, the appeal may be dismissed as abandoned. 00-03384
03/10/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Status Report. 00-03844
03/29/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We vacate the stay entered on November 4, 1999.] NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-05010
04/25/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal (SEALED). 00-06625
04/25/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 27, 2000. 00-06625