judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JONATHAN W. YOUNG V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0738
Short Caption:JONATHAN W. YOUNG V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-21289-09Filed Date:06/11/2010

Opening Event Date:06/11/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/14/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/15/2010
Argued/Submitted:05/12/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/01/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJonathan W. Young Y
Julian S. GreenspunYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/11/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/24/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Julian S. Greenspun, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
06/24/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Julian S. Greenspun, Esquire
07/20/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
09/14/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (7 pgs/tape) 10/3/09 proc.
09/14/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (27 pgs/Wood) 10/27/09 proc.
09/14/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (42 pgs/Ramos) 3/4/10 proc.
09/14/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (138 pgs/Rogers) 3/8/10 proc.
09/14/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (104 pgs/Hill) 3/9/10 proc.
09/14/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (26 pgs/tape) 5/13/10 proc. cd attached
09/14/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/17/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
09/20/2010RECORD COPIES
09/20/2010RECORD INDEX
09/20/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (Pretrial report 10/3/09 order--Judge Keary - filed 1/26/10. ***SEALED***
10/25/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
10/25/2010APPENDIX
11/24/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 12/8/10
12/03/2010APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF for 12 day (January 10, 2011) no oppo)
12/07/2010error
12/08/2010RECEIVED- aple's brief
12/15/2010 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, and the lodged brief of appellee, and the motion of appellant for an extension of time within which to file the reply brief, it is ORDERED that the motion of appellee for an extension to file the brief is granted, and the lodged brief of appellee is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the reply brief is granted, and the reply brief of appellant shall be filed on or before January 10, 2011. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division as soon as the calendar permits. (Castillo)
12/15/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
12/15/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
12/28/2010APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
02/17/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
04/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
05/12/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/12/2011SUBMITTED before Judges Fisher, Belson, Steadman
06/09/2011AFFIRMED (MOJ) (Fisher, Associate Judge, and Belson and Steadman, Senior Judges.)
07/01/2011MANDATE ISSUED
01/17/2012FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate (Appellant)Denied
01/23/2012FiledTMC//MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE
08/03/2012FiledLetter From appellant in regards to case status (Appellant)
01/11/2013FiledLetter From Appellant in regards to case status (Appellant)
01/22/2013FiledLetter From Appellant in regards to case status (Appellant)
01/29/2013FiledORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE
02/11/2013FiledLetter From appellant requesting copies of documents (Appellant)