judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

MARCIAN JENCKES, ET AL. v. MERCANTILE NATIONAL BANK AT DALLAS, TEXAS PACIFIC LAND TRUST, STATE OF TEXAS, ALL PERSONS INTERESTED IN, CLAIMING OR ASSERTING AN INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY AND ESTATE DESCRIBED IN PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

Case: A-11784
A-11784
12/01/1966
Application for Writ of Error
MARCIAN JENCKES, ET AL.
MERCANTILE NATIONAL BANK AT DALLAS, TEXAS PACIFIC LAND TRUST, STATE OF TEXAS, ALL PERSONS INTERESTED IN, CLAIMING OR ASSERTING AN INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY AND ESTATE DESCRIBED IN PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Remarks Document
07/26/1967Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/27/1967Reply to ResponsePetitioner
12/16/1966Response to PetitionRespondent
12/15/1966Response to PetitionRespondent
12/15/1966Response to PetitionRespondent
12/14/1966Response to PetitionRespondent
12/01/1966Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Remarks Document
08/02/1967Response to Motion filed
07/31/1967Response to Motion filed
07/26/1967Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/27/1967Reply to Response
12/16/1966Response to Petition
12/15/1966Response to Petition
12/15/1966Response to Petition
12/14/1966Response to Petition
12/01/1966Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/01/1966Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Pacific Land TrustRespondent
All Persons Interested in, Claiming or Asserting an Interest in the Property and Estate Described in Plaintiffs Original PetitionRespondent
Marcian Jenckes, et al.Petitioner
Mercantile National Bank at DallasRespondent
State of TexasRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information