Case: A-11768
A-11768
11/21/1966
Application for Writ of Error
ANNA GOLDLUSTOVA FRANCIS
GARNET P. FRANCIS, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/14/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
11/30/1966 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
11/21/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/22/1967 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
03/14/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
03/01/1967 | Opinion issued | | ||
12/14/1966 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/30/1966 | Response to Petition | | ||
11/21/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
11/21/1966 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Anna Goldlustova Francis | Petitioner | |
Garnet P. Francis, Jr. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information