Case: A-11757
A-11757
11/10/1966
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS
CHARLES R. HALEY, JR. AND WIFE, THELMA HALEY, BILLUPS OF BEAUMONT, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/13/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
12/29/1966 | Supplement to Petition filed | Petitioner | | |
12/08/1966 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
11/23/1966 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
11/10/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/13/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
12/29/1966 | Supplement to Petition filed | | ||
12/08/1966 | Response to Petition | | ||
11/23/1966 | Response to Petition | | ||
11/10/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
11/10/1966 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State of Texas | Petitioner | |
Charles R. Haley, Jr. and wife, Thelma Haley | Respondent | |
Billups of Beaumont, Inc. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information