Case: A-11758
A-11758
11/10/1966
Application for Writ of Error
C. M. FROST, STATE OF TEXAS
RALPH LOWE ESTATES, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, SOCONY MOBIL OIL COMPANY, INC., ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/27/1968 | Brief in Support of Petition | Respondent | | |
07/31/1968 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
07/31/1968 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
12/12/1967 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
12/11/1967 | Response to Brief filed | Respondent | | |
11/21/1967 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner | | |
07/17/1967 | Supplement to Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
07/05/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
06/27/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
01/09/1967 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
12/19/1966 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
11/10/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
11/10/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/23/1968 | Dissenting opinion issued. | | ||
09/27/1968 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
08/06/1968 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
07/31/1968 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
07/31/1968 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
07/17/1968 | Dissenting opinion issued. | | ||
07/17/1968 | Opinion issued | | ||
12/12/1967 | Reply to Response | | ||
12/11/1967 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
11/21/1967 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
10/04/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/04/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/04/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/04/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/04/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
07/17/1967 | Supplement to Motion for Rehearing | | ||
07/05/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Filing granted | | |
06/27/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Filing granted | | |
01/09/1967 | Reply to Response | | ||
12/19/1966 | Response to Petition | | ||
11/10/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
11/10/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
11/10/1966 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State of Texas | Petitioner | |
Ralph Lowe Estates | Respondent | |
C. M. Frost | Petitioner | |
Atlantic Richfield Company | Respondent | |
Socony Mobil Oil Company, Inc., et al. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information