judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ARAMIS REKDAHL, ET UX. v. JAMES M. LONG, ET AL.

Case: A-11790
A-11790
12/05/1966
Application for Writ of Error
ARAMIS REKDAHL, ET UX.
JAMES M. LONG, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Remarks Document
07/14/1967Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/17/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
12/05/1966Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Remarks Document
07/19/1967Dissenting opinion issued.
07/14/1967Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/28/1967Dissenting opinion issued.
06/28/1967Opinion issued
01/25/1967Document received (See Remarks)
01/25/1967Document received (See Remarks)
01/25/1967Document received (See Remarks)
01/25/1967Document received (See Remarks)
01/17/1967Response to Petition
12/05/1966Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/05/1966Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
James M. Long, et al.Respondent
Aramis Rekdahl, et ux.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information