judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WALTER A. THOMAS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-0749
Short Caption:WALTER A. THOMAS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM567-10Filed Date:06/10/2010

Opening Event Date:06/10/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/29/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/25/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWalter A. Thomas Y
Cedric D. MillerYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Angela Pegram Saffoe NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/10/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/28/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Cedric D. Miller, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (GP)
06/28/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Cedric D. Miller, Esquire
07/23/2010 On consideration of this court's order of June 28, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (JAC)
07/26/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (20pgs/Tape) 5/18/10 proc. w/CD
07/26/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/need more RT)dfe
07/30/2010ORDERED, ss, that this court's order of July 23, 2010, is hereby vacated. (ISR)
08/12/2010RECORD INDEX
08/12/2010RECORD COPIES
09/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (27pgs/Janifer) 5/4/10 proc.
09/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (8pgs/Tape) 5/5/10 proc.
09/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (7pgs/Tape) 5/25/10 proc. w/CD included
09/29/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/01/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
11/01/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF w/ appendix attached
11/01/2010APPENDIX
12/01/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
12/02/2010TMC - motion for summary affirmance
02/04/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED. See Oliver T. Carr Mgm't Inc. v. Nat'l Deli Inc. 397 A.2d 914, 915 (Dc 1979)... SEE HARDCOPY It is *****MORE*****
02/04/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal be and hereby IS AFFIRMED. (GLTHTE) (rf)
02/25/2011MANDATE ISSUED