judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CAMPBELL COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT, STATE OF WYOMING, et al., LARAMIE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. ONE, et al.; WYOMING EDUCATION ASSOCIATION; WYOMING SCHOOL BOARD ASSOCIATION, BIG HORN COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. ONE, et al. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-74)
Case Number:06-74Case Docketed On:04/06/2006
Linked To: 06-75
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Education (Title 21)
Short Title:CAMPBELL COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT, STATE OF WYOMING, et al., LARAMIE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. ONE, et al.; WYOMING EDUCATION ASSOCIATION; WYOMING SCHOOL BOARD ASSOCIATION, BIG HORN COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. ONE, et al. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CAMPBELL COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT, STATE OF WYOMING, et al., Appellants (Plaintiffs), LARAMIE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. ONE, et al.; WYOMING EDUCATION ASSOCIATION; WYOMING SCHOOL BOARD ASSOCIATION Appellants (intervening Plaintiffs), BIG HORN COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. ONE, et al., Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCampbell County School DistrictFord T. Bussart
Marvin L. Tyler
AppellantLaramie County School District No. 1Paul J. Hickey
Richard D. Bush
AppellantWyoming Education AssociationPatrick E. Hacker
Gregory Patrick Hacker
Erin Maureen Kendall
AppellantWyoming School Board AssociationTracy J. Copenhaver
AppellantBig Horn County School District No. 1Timothy J. Kirven
Benjamin Scott Kirven
AppellantTeton County School District No. 1Sara E. Van Genderen
AppellantNatrona School District No. 1Kathleen Baker Dixon
Stefanie Lee Boster
AppelleeThe State of WyomingMichael R. O'Donnell
Rhonda Sigrist Woodard

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Schools
Opinion Number:2008 WY 2
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/06/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/06/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/06/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/06/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/24/2006Notice-Incoming - Designation of record. Joinder of appellant Teton County School District No. 1 in the designation of record on appeal of appellant Laramie County School District No. 1.Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
05/17/2006Brief - Appellant, Wyoming School Board Association; and received copy of designation of record on appeal 5/24/06.BriefAppellantFinal
05/23/2006Brief - Appellants. Campbell County School District, Sweetwater County School District Number One, Sweetwater County School District Number Two, and Uinta County School District Number One; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
05/23/2006Brief - Appellant Big Horn County School District Number One, et al.; and received copy of brief on cd rom.BriefAppellantFinal
05/23/2006Brief - Appellant Wyoming Education Association.BriefAppellantFinal
05/24/2006Notice-Incoming - Statement of costs. Wyoming School Boards Association.Notice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
05/24/2006Brief - Appellant Teton County School District No. 1; and received copy of brief on disk on 6/7/06.BriefAppellantFinal
05/24/2006Notice-Incoming - Statement of costs. Joinder of appellant Teton County School District No. 1 in the statement of costs of appellant Campbell County School District No. 1, et al.Notice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
05/24/2006Brief - Appellant, Laramie County School District No. One; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
05/24/2006Motion - Oral argument - exceed time limit; and received proposed order.MotionOral argument - exceed time limitFinal
05/24/2006Brief - Appellant (Intervening Plaintiff) Natrona County School District Number One; and received copy of designation of record on 5/25/06.BriefAppellantFinal
05/26/2006Notice-Internal - Recusal memo. Justice Burke recused.Notice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
05/26/2006Notice-Internal - Recusal memo. Chief Justice Hill recused.Notice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
05/30/2006Motion - Consolidate. State's motion to consolidate its appellee brief(s) and obtain an exception to rule 7.06, Wyoming Rules of Appellate Procedure.MotionConsolidateFinal
05/30/2006Order - Grant. Order granting motion requesting exception to W.R.A.P. 1.01(c)OrderGrantFinal
06/01/2006Response/Objection - Motion. State of Wyoming's response to appellants' motion to enlkarge time for oral argument.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
06/02/2006Order - Assignment of judge. Chief Justice Hill and Justice Burke recused and assigning District Judge Jeffrey A. Donnell and District Judge Norman E. Young to act in this matter.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
06/02/2006Order - Assignment of judge. Chief Justice Hill and Justice Burke recused and assigning District Judge Jeffrey A. Donnell and District Judge Norman E. Young to act in this matter.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
06/05/2006Motion - Admission pro hac vice. Motion pro hac vice and entry of appearance as local counsel.MotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
06/05/2006Motion - Amicus - leave to participate. Motion to file brief as amici curiae; and received proposed brief of amici curiae. (Northern Arapaho Tribe and Wyoming Parent Teacher Association)MotionAmicus - leave to participateFinal
06/06/2006Order - Grant. Order granting motion to enlarge time for oral argument. (two hours total)OrderGrantFinal
06/09/2006Response/Objection - Motion. Challengers' response to state's motion to consolidate appellee briefs and obtain an exception to rule 7.06, Wyoming Rules of Appellate Procedure.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
06/09/2006Response/Objection - Motion. State of Wyoming's response to motion to file brief as amici curiae.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
06/10/2006Notice-Incoming - Change of address. (Kathleen B. Dixon)Notice-IncomingChange of addressFinal
06/12/2006Notice-Incoming - Other. Amended certificate of service for the State of Wyoming's response to motion to file brief as amici curiae.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/15/2006Order - Grant. Order granting motion to consolidate appellee briefs (and extend filing time by 30 days).OrderGrantFinal
06/15/2006Order - Amicus - deny participation. Order denying leave to file brief of amicus curiae.OrderAmicus - deny participationFinal
06/23/2006Motion - Clarification. State's motion for clarification of stay.MotionClarificationFinal
07/10/2006Response/Objection - Motion. Response of WSBA, Campbell County School District, Sweetwater County School District No. 1, Sweetwater County School District No. 2, and Uinta County School District No. 1, to state's motion for clarification of stay.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
07/11/2006Response/Objection - Reply. State's reply to response regarding motion for clarification of stay.Response/ObjectionReplyFinal
07/18/2006Order - Granting motion to clarify stay.OrderGrantFinal
08/10/2006Brief - Appellee, State of Wyoming; received copy of brief on flash drive; and received certification of no additional designation of the record for transmission to the Wyoming Supreme Court.BriefAppelleeFinal
08/21/2006Notice-Incoming - Change of address (Stefanie L. Boster)Notice-IncomingChange of addressFinal
08/28/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/06/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, sixty-four volumes. Volumes I-XVIII, original papers; volume XIX, second amended final exhibit list; volumes XX-XXXIV, transcripts; volumes XXXV-XXXI, exhibits; volume XXXII, original Supreme Court record from first appeal; volumes XXXXIII-XXXXVII, original Supreme Court record from second appeal; volumes XXXXVIII-LXIV, transcripts, dispositions and exhibits from original first and second appeals to Supreme Court. *NOTE: designated index dated August 31, 2006 does not match original index dated March 31, 2006 as pleadings are in different volumes than cited on briefs. Per Chief Justice Voigt, the record is not to be returned to Clerk of District Court for correction.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/12/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/08/2006Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Golden and Kite, and DJJ's Donnell and Young (Tracy J. Copenhaver, Richard D. Bush, Sara E. Van Genderen, Kathleen B. Dixon, Ford T. Bussart, Marvin L. Tyler, Patrick E. Hacker, Gregory P. Hacker, and Timothy J. Kirven, arguments by Messrs. Bush, Copenhaver, Bussart, Kirven, and P. Hacker for appellants in Case No. 06-74; Michael R. O'Donnell, State's Counsel and Rhonda Sigrist Woodard, Special Assistant Attorney General, argument by Mr. O'Donnell and Ms. Woodard for appellees in Case No. 06-74) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/08/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice.Notice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/11/2006Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
06/13/2007Notice-Incoming - Additional authority. Second notice of supplemental authorities.Notice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
06/22/2007Notice-Incoming - Additional authority (response to State's notice)Notice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
01/08/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/24/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/24/2008Record - Record returned to district court. Arrangements made by Hickey & Evans, LLP to transport record back to the First Judicial District Court by Interstate Moving.RecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/24/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/24/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/31/2008Notice-Incoming - Other. Record return receipt. Record signed for 1/25/08 by First Judicial Clerk of District Court. Record (40 boxes) transported by Interstate Moving.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal